EP0986416 - REPLENISHABLE STENT AND DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill Saint Michael Barbados / BB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill Saint Michael Barbados / BB | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Corporation One Boston Scientific Place Natick, Massachusetts 01760 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRY, James 35 Jackson Circle Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926153.2 | 02.06.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US11138 | Priority number, date | US19970867292 | 02.06.1997 Original published format: US 867292 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855174 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986416 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986416 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0057 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1013 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2000/12] | Title | German: | NACHFÜLLBARER STENT UND VERABREICHUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/12] | English: | REPLENISHABLE STENT AND DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2000/12] | French: | EXTENSEUR POUVANT ETRE RE-ALIMENTE ET SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5368566 (CROCKER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1,9 *; | [X]US5421826 (CROCKER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 7 *; | [DA]US5439446 (BARRY JAMES [US]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [X]US5569184 (CROCKER MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 6 * | International search | [A]US4922905 (STRECKER ERNST P [DE]); | [A]US5108416 (RYAN CAROL A [US], et al); | [A]US5242399 (LAU LILIP [US], et al) | Examination | EP0716836 |