EP1051455 - FIRE BARRIER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDIN, Heather, V. P.O.Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98926195.3 | 08.06.1998 | [2000/46] | WO1998US11314 | Priority number, date | US19980016876 | 30.01.1998 Original published format: US 16876 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938932 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051455 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1051455 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/14, C08K13/04, // (C08K13/04, 3:00), C08K7:02 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C08K7/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09K21/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/016 (EP,KR,US);
E04B1/941 (KR);
Y10S428/921 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2000/46] | Title | German: | FEUERSCHUTZMATERIAL | [2000/46] | English: | FIRE BARRIER MATERIAL | [2000/46] | French: | MATERIAU COUPE-FEU | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0452567 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * example 12 * * claims 1,14-19 *; | [A]WO9219799 (COURTAULDS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-17 * example 3 ** claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO9421748 (BTR PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-20 *; | [X]EP0687555 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-8 * |