EP1023396 - COMPATIBILIZED BLENDS OF A THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER AND A POLYOLEFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Noveon IP Holdings Corp. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states The BFGoodrich Company 3 Coliseum Centre, 2550 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, North Carolina 28217-3022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARKAS, Julius 36200 Behm Drive North Ridgeville, OH 44039 / US | 02 /
JACOBS, Charles, Patrick 706 Bowling Green Circle Elyria, OH 44035 / US | 03 /
LAWSON, Dennis, Lee 1720 Substation Road Brunswick, OH 44212 / US | 04 /
WILSON, Gary, Franklin 38490 River Ridge Court Grafton, OH 44044 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98926222.5 | 03.06.1998 | [2000/31] | WO1998US11368 | Priority number, date | US19970951013 | 15.10.1997 Original published format: US 951013 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919406 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023396 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023396 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08L75/04, C08L77/00, C08L67/02 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4288 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/69 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/12 (KR);
C08L67/025 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L2205/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2207/04 (KR);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3203 (EP,US);
C08L67/025, C08L23/00 (US,EP);
C08L75/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L23/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | VERTRÄGLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON THERMOPLASTISCHEN ELASTOMEREN UND POLYOLEFINEN | [2000/31] | English: | COMPATIBILIZED BLENDS OF A THERMOPLASTIC ELASTOMER AND A POLYOLEFIN | [2000/31] | French: | MELANGES COMPATIBILISES D'UN ELASTOMERE THERMOPLASTIQUE ET D'UNE POLYOLEFINE | [2000/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.01.2003 | FI | 29.01.2003 | GR | 29.01.2003 | DK | 29.04.2003 | PT | 29.04.2003 | SE | 29.04.2003 | CY | 03.06.2003 | IE | 03.06.2003 | LU | 03.06.2003 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/36] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
CY | 03.06.2003 | ||
IE | 03.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
IE | 03.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 29.01.2003 | |
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 29.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0131714 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [Y] 1-14* claim - *; | [Y]EP0641828 (MILES INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * claim - * |