EP0988210 - CONTROLLABLE CAB SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORD Corporation 111 Lord Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states LORD CORPORATION 111 Lord Drive, P.O. Box 8012 Cary, NC 27512-8012 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTANZARITE, David, M. 12371 Crestview Court Edinboro, PA 16412 / US | 02 /
ST. CLAIR, Kenneth, A. 112 Hidden Bluff Lane Cary, NC 27513 / US | 03 /
MARJORAM, Robert, H. 4905 Timbergreen Lane Holly Springs, NC 27540 / US | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926321.5 | 11.06.1998 | [2000/13] | WO1998US11599 | Priority number, date | US19970876656 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: US 876656 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856642 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0988210 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0988210 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
B60G99/008 (EP,US);
B62D33/0608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | REGELBARE AUFHÄNGUNG FÜR EIN FAHRERHAUS | [2000/13] | English: | CONTROLLABLE CAB SUSPENSION | [2000/13] | French: | SUSPENSION CONTROLABLE POUR CABINE DE VEHICULE | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 30.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5623410 (FURIHATA KENICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,16,17 * column 2, line 63 - column 6, line 26; figures 1,2,4,11 * [A] 23; | [DA]US5492312 (CARLSON J DAVID [US]) [DA] 20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0523894 (LORD CORP [US]) | Examination | JPH09109921 | US5390121 |