blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0988084

EP0988084 - STYLETS FOR ENHANCING IMPLANTATION OF THIN ENDOCARDIAL LEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERMEDICS INC.
4000 Technology Drive Angleton
Texas 77515 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
INTERMEDICS INC.
4000 Technology Drive
Angleton Texas 77515 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALT, Eckhard, U.
Eichendorff Strasse 52
D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE
02 / STOTTS, Lawrence, J.
327 Linden Lane
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98926538.409.06.1998
[2000/13]
WO1998US12075
Priority number, dateUS1997087403712.06.1997         Original published format: US 874037
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9856456
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0988084
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61N1/05
[2000/13]
CPC:
A61N1/056 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/18]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:STILETT ZUM ERLEICHTERN DER IMPLANTATION VON ENDOKARDIALEN ZULEITUNGEN[2000/13]
English:STYLETS FOR ENHANCING IMPLANTATION OF THIN ENDOCARDIAL LEADS[2000/13]
French:STYLETS FACILITANT L'IMPLANTATION DE SONDES ENDOCAVITAIRES MINCES[2000/13]
Entry into regional phase10.12.1999National basic fee paid 
10.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
01.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/24]
04.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4146036  (DUTCHER ROBERT G, et al) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 3, line 44 - column 9, line 7; figure - *;
 [A]US4257429  (DICKHUDT EUGENE A, et al) [A] 1,2,4-7 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 5; figure - *;
 [A]WO9619259  (INTERMEDICS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 32; figure - *;
 [A]WO9204074  (EP TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1,4 * page 42, line 1 - line 31; figure - *
by applicantUS4967766
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.