EP0990074 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR BORING HOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techmo Entwicklungs- und Vertriebs GmbH Hauptstrasse 52 8753 Fohnsdorf / AT | For all designated states "ALWAG" Tunnelausbau Gesellschaft m.b.H. Wagram 49 4061 Pasching / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Techmo Entwicklungs- und Vertriebs GmbH Hauptstrasse 52 8753 Fohnsdorf / AT | ||
For all designated states "Alwag" Tunnelausbau Gesellschaft mbH Wagram 49 4061 Pasching / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOCIVNIK, Josef Bachstrasse 12 A-8753 Fohnsdorf / AT | 02 /
BÖHM, Karl Sommerlandstrasse 12 A-4052 Ansfelden / AT | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Miksovsky, Alexander, et al Patentanwalt Miksovsky KG Bisamberger Strasse 19 2100 Korneuburg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Miksovsky, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Miksovsky & Pollhammer OEG, Währingerstrasse 3/14 1096 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98927998.9 | 17.06.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998AT00149 | Priority number, date | AT19970001064 | 18.06.1997 Original published format: AT 106497 | [2000/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858132 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990074 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/76, E21D21/00 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
E21D21/0033 (EP,US);
E21B10/44 (KR);
E02D5/76 (EP,US);
E21D21/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, PT [2000/14] | Extension states | SI | 21.12.1999 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BOHREN VON LÖCHERN | [2000/14] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR BORING HOLES | [2000/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CREUSER DES TROUS DE FORAGE | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/20] | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   01.03.2000 | 16.02.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   01.03.2000 | 16.02.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   01.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE4036721 (DALLA GASSA GAETANO VALDAGNO [IT]) [X] 1-8,10 * page 3, column L, line 26 - line 58; figure - * [Y] 9,11; | [Y]DE1484572 (STUMP BOHR AG) [Y] 9,11 * column 3, line 17 - line 30 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 16; figure - *; | [A]US4253781 (FISCHER JOACHIM, et al) [A] 1,6 * column A; figure - *; | [A]DE19503122 (REBURG PATENTVERWERTUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 6, line 7 - line 65; figure - * * column 7, line 17 - line 24 * | by applicant | AT390303B |