blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970440

EP0970440 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR CHANGING IMAGE RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.02.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2003  [2003/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OCÉ Printing Systems GmbH
Siemensallee 2
85586 Poing / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Océ Printing Systems GmbH
Siemensallee 2
85586 Poing / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PETSCHIK, Benno
Melanchthonweg 6
D-85570 Markt Schwaben / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstraße 31
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date98928093.826.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998DE00907
Priority number, dateDE1997101307927.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19713079
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843207
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970440
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970440
Date:17.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:G06T3/40, H04N1/40
[2000/02]
CPC:
G06T3/403 (EP,US); H04N1/40068 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:BILDBEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM VERÄNDERN DER BILDAUFLÖSUNG[2000/02]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR CHANGING IMAGE RESOLUTION[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET CIRCUIT POUR MODIFIER LA RESOLUTION D'IMAGE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
10.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2002Fee for grant paid
02.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5797271  ;
 [A]EP0708415  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,9,11 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE4206277  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO) [DA] 1,9,11 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0149120  (IBM [US]) [DA] 1,9,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - "IMAGE SCALING WITH TWO-DIMENSIONAL MEMORY ARRAYS", IBM TDB, (199107), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 4 - 9, XP000210549 [A] 1,9,11 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 19; figures 1,2; table 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820918), vol. 006, no. 182, Database accession no. (E - 131), & JP57097271 A 19820616 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.