blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974048

EP0974048 - DEVICE FOR OPTICALLY TESTING SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / DRABAREK, Pawel
Parkstrasse 16/5
D-75233 Tiefenbronn / DE
02 / OFEN, Rolf
Bruennleinstrasse 3
D-96173 Oberhaid / DE
03 / KUEHNLE, Goetz
Schubartstrasse 2
D-71282 Hemmingen / DE
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date98928127.403.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998DE00950
Priority number, dateDE199711420207.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19714202
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9845689
Date:15.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974048
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974048
Date:29.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/88, G02B23/24
[2000/04]
CPC:
G02B23/2407 (EP,US); G01N21/954 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM OPTISCHEN PRÜFEN VON OBERFLÄCHEN[2000/04]
English:DEVICE FOR OPTICALLY TESTING SURFACES[2000/04]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE OPTIQUE DE SURFACES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase08.11.1999National basic fee paid 
08.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
02.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2005Fee for grant paid
31.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0267705  (SIRA LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5,6,14 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 43; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2126715  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1,14 * abstract *;
 [D]DE3232904  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]DE4206609  (OPTOELEKTRONISCHE INSPEKTIONS [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 19; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5381225  (KOHNO MICHIO [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS58223113
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840411), vol. 008, no. 079, Database accession no. (P - 267), & JP58223113 A 19831224 (KOA:KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.