EP0977716 - USE OF ALCOHOLS AS ADDITIVES FOR PLASTER AND/OR MORTAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/16] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTE, Heinz-Günther Winsterstrasse 66 D-45481 Mülheim / DE | 02 /
MOUSTAKAS, Sarantis Alte Linner Strasse 11 D-47799 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
GRESS, Wolfgang Westfalenweg 245 D-42111 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
NEUMANN, Ralf Kastanienweg 4 D-42781 Haan / DE | [2000/06] | Application number, filing date | 98928209.0 | 20.04.1998 | [2000/06] | WO1998EP02321 | Priority number, date | DE1997117936 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19717936 | [2000/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9849114 | Date: | 05.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977716 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977716 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/02 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C04B20/1022 (EP,US);
C04B24/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B20/1022, C04B14/062 (EP,US);
C04B20/1022, C04B20/002 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ALKOHOLEN ALS ADDITIVE FÜR PUTZE UND/ODER MÖRTEL | [2000/06] | English: | USE OF ALCOHOLS AS ADDITIVES FOR PLASTER AND/OR MORTAR | [2000/06] | French: | UTILISATION D'ALCOOLS COMME ADDITIFS POUR ENDUITS ET/OU MORTIERS | [2000/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 15.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5176752 (SCHEINER PAUL [US]) [A] 1,13,18 * column 3 - column 5; claims 1,13 *; | [XD]WO9504008 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [XD] 1,13,18 * page 5 - page 6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0766586 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,13,18 * sentence 6 - sentence 25 ** page 5, line 36 - line 42 * |