EP0983240 - LIGHT-STABILIZED ORGANIC POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Lakes Chemical (Europe) GmbH Juchstrasse 45 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRISCI, Luciana Via S. Angelo, 75 I-20074 Graffignana / IT | 02 /
BROUSSARD, Fabio P.zza V. Veneto, 4 I-24060 Brusaporto / IT | 03 /
NERI, Carlo Via Europa, 32 I-20097 S. Donato M.se / IT | 04 /
ADOVASIO, Mauro Via G. Mattioli, 16/A I-24129 Bergamo / IT | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98928228.0 | 07.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998EP02678 | Priority number, date | IT1997MI01064 | 08.05.1997 Original published format: IT MI971064 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850360 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983240 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/46, C07D211/58, C07D401/12, C08K5/3435, C08K5/3492, C09D7/12 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
C07D211/72 (EP,US);
C07D211/46 (EP,US);
C07D211/58 (EP,US);
C08K5/34926 (EP,US);
C09D7/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | LICHT-STABILISIERTE ORGANISCHE POLYMERE | [2000/10] | English: | LIGHT-STABILIZED ORGANIC POLYMERS | [2000/10] | French: | POLYMERES ORGANIQUES RENDUS STABLES A LA LUMIERE | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 01.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/22] | 28.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2849444 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1,2,5,9,19-22 * page 9, lines 6-21; claim 1 *; | [X]DE3533451 (PARAMONOV VLADIMIR IVANOVIC, et al) [X] 1,2,19-21 * example 16; claims 1-4; tables 2,5 *; | [A]US4855434 (CANTATORE GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 7, lines 39-48 * * column 12, lines 26-38 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0345221 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-22* page 10, lines 39-45; examples 18-21; claim 1 * |