EP0960375 - DATA BUS DEVICE HAVING MEANS FOR THE ALLOCATION OF INFORMATION AFTER A BUS RESET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERKINGER, Erwin Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN HUSEN, Günther Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1999/48] | Röggla, Harald, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Triester Strasse 64 1101 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 98928499.7 | 09.07.1998 | [1999/48] | WO1998IB01052 | Priority number, date | EP19970890151 | 29.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97890151 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9906916 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0960375 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16, G06F13/36 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
H04L12/40078 (EP,US);
G06F13/16 (KR);
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
H04N21/4113 (EP,US);
H04N21/4135 (EP,US);
H04N21/4363 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/48] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT MÖGLICHKEIT DER ZUWEISUNG VON INFORMATIONEN NACH EINEM DATENBUSRESET | [1999/48] | English: | DATA BUS DEVICE HAVING MEANS FOR THE ALLOCATION OF INFORMATION AFTER A BUS RESET | [1999/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BUS DE DONNEES MUNI D'UN MOYEN D'ATTRIBUTION D'INFORMATIONS APRES REMISE A ZERO DU BUS | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 23.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5402115 (TANAKA SHOTARO [JP]); | [Y]JP07131470 ; | [Y]EP0689296 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0637140 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP 07131470 A (SONY CORP) 19 May 1995., & JP07131470 A 19950519 |