blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0991632

EP0991632 - NEW THIAZOLIDINEDIONE, OXAZOLIDINEDIONE AND OXADIAZOLIDINEDIONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.12.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.02.2004  [2004/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AstraZeneca AB
151 85 Södertälje / SE
[2000/19]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Astra Aktiebolag
151 85 Södertälje / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSSON, Kjell
Astra Hässle AB
S-431 83 Mölndal / SE
02 / BOIJE, Maria
Astra Hässle AB
S-431 83 Mölndal / SE
03 / LINDSTEDT, Eva-Lotte
Astra Hässle AB
S-431 81 Mölndal / SE
04 / LJUNG, Bengt
Astra Hässle AB
S-431 83 Mölndal / SE
05 / NORDEN, Bo
Astra Hässle AB
S-431 83 Mölndal / SE
[2000/15]
Application number, filing date98928757.804.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998SE01066
Priority number, dateSE1997000230517.06.1997         Original published format: SE 9702305
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9857941
Date:23.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991632
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07D277/34, C07D263/20, C07D271/07, A61K31/425, A61K31/42, A61K31/41
[2000/15]
CPC:
C07D263/44 (EP,US); A61P3/10 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D271/07 (EP,US); C07D277/34 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesLT17.01.2000
LV17.01.2000
MK17.01.2000
RO17.01.2000
SI17.01.2000
TitleGerman:THIAZOLIDINDION-, OXAZOLIDINDION- UND OXADIAZOLIDINDION-DERIVATE[2000/15]
English:NEW THIAZOLIDINEDIONE, OXAZOLIDINEDIONE AND OXADIAZOLIDINEDIONE DERIVATIVES[2000/15]
French:NOUVEAUX THIAZOLIDINEDIONES, OXAZOLIDINEDIONES ET DERIVES D'OXAZOLIDINEDIONES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2000National basic fee paid 
17.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
17.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
20.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/06]
03.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0008203  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0139421  (SANKYO CO [JP]);
 [A]US5223522  (CLARK DAVID A [US], et al)
 [A]  - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., Volume 30, No. 10, 1982, TAKASHI SOHDA et al., "Studies on Antidiabetic Agents. II.1) Synthesis of 5-4-(-Methylcyclohexylmethoxybenzyl Thiazolidine-2,4-Dione (ADD-3878) and Its Derivatives", pages 3580-3600.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.