EP0984831 - MOULDED ACTIVATED METALLIC FIXED-BED CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2002 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREUND, Andreas 32 Putnam Avenue White Plains, NY 10606-2228 / US | 02 /
BERWEILER, Monika Tilsiter Strasse 10 D-63477 Maintal / DE | 03 /
BENDER, Barbara Landwehr 1 D-63517 Rodenbach / DE | 04 /
KEMPF, Bernd Riemenschneiderstrasse 38 D-63839 Kleinwallstadt / DE | [2000/13] |
Former [2000/12] | 01 /
Freund, Andreas 32 Putnam Avenue White Plains, NY 10606-2228 / US | ||
02 /
BERWEILER, Monika Tilsiter Strasse 10 D-63477 Maintal / DE | |||
03 /
BENDER, Barbara Landwehr 1 D-63517 Rodenbach / DE | |||
04 /
KEMPF, Bernd Riemenschneiderstrasse 38 D-63839 Kleinwallstadt / DE | |||
Former [2000/11] | 01 /
FREUND, Andreas Robert-Koch-Strasse 3 D-63801 Kleinostheim / DE | ||
02 /
BERWEILER, Monika Tilsiter Strasse 10 D-63477 Maintal / DE | |||
03 /
BENDER, Barbara Landwehr 1 D-63517 Rodenbach / DE | |||
04 /
KEMPF, Bernd Riemenschneiderstrasse 38 D-63839 Kleinwallstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 98929266.9 | 27.04.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998EP02481 | Priority number, date | DE1997121898 | 26.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19721898 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853910 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984831 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984831 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J25/00 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
C07C209/36 (EP,US);
B01J25/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/633 (EP,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
C07B41/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C209/36, C07C211/46 (EP,US);
C07C29/145, C07C31/10 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | GEFORMTER, AKTIVIERTER METALL-FESTBETTKATALYSATOR | [2000/11] | English: | MOULDED ACTIVATED METALLIC FIXED-BED CATALYST | [2000/11] | French: | CATALYSEUR METALLIQUE A LIT FIXE ACTIVE MOULE | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1017044 (ICI LTD) [A] 1-4 * claim 2 *; | [DA]EP0648534 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DA] 1-4* claims 2,7 *; | [A]EP0734765 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-4 * claim 1 * |