Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0985038
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.09.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] |
07.06.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
21.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.01.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
28.01.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
17.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|