blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0984986

EP0984986 - HUMAN TYPE 3 RYANODINE RECEPTOR PROTEIN AND DNA MOLECULES CODING THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
[2000/39]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GmbH
Postfach 200
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HAKAMATA, Yasuhiro
A104 Jyohokunishikosya 215, Jyohoku
Shizuoka 420 / JP
02 / NISHIMURA, Seiichiro
2-4-5-104, Segawa Mino
Osaka 562 / JP
03 / BARSOUMIAN, Edward, L.
2-6-18-801, Nishimidorigaoka Toyonaka
Osaka 560 / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Kläs, Heinz-Gerd, et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim/Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/45]Kläs, Heinz-Gerd, Dr., et al
Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173
55216 Ingelheim/Rhein / DE
Former [2000/11]Laudien, Dieter, Dr., et al
c/o Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH
55216 Ingelheim / DE
Application number, filing date98929337.818.05.1998
[2000/11]
WO1998EP02926
Priority number, dateDE199712231728.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19722317
[2000/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9854212
Date:03.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984986
Date:15.03.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.03.1999
ClassificationIPC:C07K19/00, C07K14/705
[2006/05]
CPC:
C07K14/705 (EP,US); A61P3/14 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US); A61K48/00 (EP,US); C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/11]C07K14/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:DAS PROTEIN DES HUMANEN RYANODINREZEPTORS VOM TYP 3 SOWIE DAFÜR KODIERENDE DNA-MOLEKÜLE[2000/11]
English:HUMAN TYPE 3 RYANODINE RECEPTOR PROTEIN AND DNA MOLECULES CODING THEREFOR[2000/11]
French:PROTEINE DU RECEPTEUR HUMAIN DE LA RYANODINE DU TYPE 3 ET MOLECULES D'ADN CODANT POUR CELLE-CI[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
06.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/49]
03.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
16.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9104328  (UNIV TORONTO [CA], et al) [A] 1-23
 [A]  XP002900281 [A] 1-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(94)00955-4
 [A]  XP002900282 [A] 1-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(92)80941-9
 [A]  XP002900283 [A] 1-23
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.