EP0932975 - VIEWFINDER APERTURE CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTS Holding International B.V. Kapittelweg 10 4827 HG Breda / NL | [2002/29] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN HERIK, Florus, Bernardus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2002/29] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON multimedia, Licensing and IP, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/31] | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 98929589.4 | 16.07.1998 | [1999/31] | WO1998IB01076 | Priority number, date | EP19970202581 | 21.08.1997 Original published format: EP 97202581 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9911057 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932975 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932975 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
H04N5/208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/31] | Title | German: | SUCHERAPERTURKORREKTUR | [1999/31] | English: | VIEWFINDER APERTURE CORRECTION | [1999/31] | French: | CORRECTION D'OUVERTURE DE VISEUR | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4015446 (BROADCAST TELEVISION SYST [DE]); | [A]DE3315857 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4680639 (ISONO HARUO [JP], et al) |