EP0927707 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COOLING EXHAUST GAS FROM BYPASS OF KILN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORPORATION 8-1, Akashicho Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8518 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Taiheiyo Cement Corporation 8-1, Akashicho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8518 / JP | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Taiheiyo Cement Corporation 8-1, Akashico Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8518 / JP | ||
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states Taiheiyo Cement Corporation 8-1, Nishikanada 3-Chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo-To / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURATA, Mitsuaki, Fujiwara Plant Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp., 1361-1, Ooaza-Tozenji Fujiwara-cho, Inabegun, Mie 511-0200 / JP | 02 /
KANEKO, Hiuma, Taiheiyo Cement Corporation 8-1, Akashico, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8518 / JP | 03 /
UENO, Naoki, Kumagaya Plant Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp., 5310, Ooaza-Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi, Saitama 360-0843 / JP | [2004/18] |
Former [1999/27] | 01 /
MURATA, Mitsuaki, Fujiwara Plant Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp., 1361-1, Ooaza-Tozenji Fujiwara-cho, Inabegun, Mie 511-0200 / JP | ||
02 /
KANEKO, Hiuma, Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp. 14-1, Nishishinbashi 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | |||
03 /
UENO, Naoki, Kumagaya Plant Chichibu Onoda Cement Corp., 5310, Ooaza-Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi, Saitama 360-0843 / JP | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr., et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98929685.0 | 25.06.1998 | [1999/27] | WO1998JP02843 | Priority number, date | JP19970192825 | 17.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19282597 | [1999/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903794 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927707 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0927707 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/60, F27B7/20 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
F27B7/20 (EP,US);
C04B7/47 (KR);
C04B14/064 (EP,US);
C04B30/02 (EP,US);
C04B7/60 (EP,US);
F27D21/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/27] | C04B7/60 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, LI [1999/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KÜHLUNG VON BYPASS ABGASEN VOM OFEN | [1999/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COOLING EXHAUST GAS FROM BYPASS OF KILN | [1999/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT PROVENANT D'UNE DERIVATION D'UN FOUR | [1999/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.1999 | Translation filed | 15.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 15.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02116649 ; | [A]JPH03152392 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900712), vol. 014, no. 326, Database accession no. (C - 0740), & JP02116649 A 19900501 (TOSOH CORP) [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910926), vol. 015, no. 381, Database accession no. (M - 1162), & JP03152392 A 19910628 (POWER REACTOR & NUCLEAR FUEL DEV CORP) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH09175847 (UBE INDUSTRIES) |