blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970952

EP0970952 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 2-OMEGA-ALKOXYCARBONYLALKANOYL)-4-BUTANOLIDES, OMEGA-HYDROXY-OMEGA-3)-KETO FATTY ESTERS, AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/02]PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 2-($g(v)-ALKOXYCARBONYLALKANOYL)-4-BUTANOLIDES, $g(v)-HYDROXY-($g(v)-3)-KETO FATTY ESTERS, AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF
[2000/30]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SODA AROMATIC COMPANY, LIMITED
15-9, 4-chome, Noncho Nihonbashi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
[2006/32]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SODA AROMATIC COMPANY, LIMITED
15-9, 4-chome, Noncho Nihonbashi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAOKA, Hideaki Noda Branch
Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. 1573-4, Funakata
Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP
02 / WADA, Sigeru Noda Branch
Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. 1573-4, Funakata
Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP
03 / ITO, Nobuhiko Noda Branch
Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. 1573-4, Funakata
Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP
04 / HASEBE, Akio Noda Branch
Soda Aromatic Co., Ltd. 1573-4, Funakata
Noda-shi Chiba 270-0233 / JP
05 / IMAMURA, Shinzo Room 1101 Nexus Yamatedori
7-1, Yamatedori 3-chome Showa-ku, Nagoya-shi
Aichi 466-0815 / JP
06 / MURAOKA, Hideo Toray Shataku D-401
1-81, Ikegamidai Midori-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 458-0044 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Coleiro, Raymond, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Coleiro, Raymond, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98929758.530.06.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP02930
Priority number, dateJP1997018902130.06.1997         Original published format: JP 18902197
JP1997018902230.06.1997         Original published format: JP 18902297
JP1997021575225.07.1997         Original published format: JP 21575297
JP1998005582720.02.1998         Original published format: JP 5582798
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9900378
Date:07.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970952
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970952
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:C07D307/32, C07C59/215, C07C51/43, C07C69/716, C07C67/32
[2000/02]
CPC:
C07D307/33 (EP,US); C07C51/43 (EP,US); C07C67/32 (EP,US);
C07C69/716 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C51/43, C07C59/215 (EP,US);
C07C67/32, C07C69/716 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-(OMEGA-ALKOXYCARBONYLALKANOYL)-4-BUTANOLIDEN,OMEGA-HYDROXY-(OMEGA-3)-KETO-FETTSÄUREESTERN UND IHRER DERIVATE[2000/02]
English:PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 2-OMEGA-ALKOXYCARBONYLALKANOYL)-4-BUTANOLIDES, OMEGA-HYDROXY-OMEGA-3)-KETO FATTY ESTERS, AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF[2000/30]
French:METHODES DE PREPARATION DE 2-OMEGA-ALCOXYCARBONYLALCANOYL)-4-BUTANOLIDES, D'ESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS OMEGA-HYDROXY-OMEGA-3)-CETONE, ET DE DERIVES DESDITES SUBSTANCES[2000/30]
Former [2000/02]PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 2-($g(v)-ALKOXYCARBONYLALKANOYL)-4-BUTANOLIDES, $g(v)-HYDROXY-($g(v)-3)-KETO FATTY ESTERS, AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF
Former [2000/02]METHODES DE PREPARATION DE 2-($g(v)-ALCOXYCARBONYLALCANOYL)-4-BUTANOLIDES, D'ESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS $g(v)-HYDROXY-($g(v)-3)-CETONE, ET DE DERIVES DESDITES SUBSTANCES
Entry into regional phase29.03.1999Translation filed 
26.03.1999National basic fee paid 
26.03.1999Search fee paid 
26.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
20.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2006Fee for grant paid
20.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
22.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH0311036  (UBE INDUSTRIES);
 [X]WO9706156  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al);
 [XP]US5693828  (BELKO ROBERT P [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.