EP0991646 - AN ITRACONAZOLE EXHIBITING AN IMPROVED SOLUBILITY, A METHOD OF PREPARING THE SAME AND A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dong A Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 252, Yongdoodong, Dongdaemoon-ku Seoul 130-070 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states Dong A Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 252, Yongdoodong, Dongdaemoon-ku Seoul 130-070 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHA, Bong-Jin Kyounghyang Apt. 27-206, Hogye-dong 800-1 Dongan-ku Anyang-si Kyungki-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
OH, Jun-Gyo Jookong Apt. 355-506, Banpo-dong 20-9 Seocho-ku Seoul 137-040 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Su-Eon Shinmaetan Apt. 34-203, Maetan-dong Paldal-ku Suwon-si Kyungki-do 442-370 / KR | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98929878.1 | 16.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998KR00164 | Priority number, date | KR19240093897 | 16.06.1997 Original published format: KR 2493897 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9857967 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991646 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991646 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/14, A61K31/41 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
A61P31/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | EIN ITRACONAZOL MIT EINER VERBESSERTEN LÖSLICHKEIT, EIN VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND EINE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG, DIE DIESES ENTHÄLT | [2000/15] | English: | AN ITRACONAZOLE EXHIBITING AN IMPROVED SOLUBILITY, A METHOD OF PREPARING THE SAME AND A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION COMPRISING THE SAME | [2000/15] | French: | ITRACONAZOLE POSSEDANT UNE MEILLEURE SOLUBILITE, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CE DERNIER ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE COMPRENANT CET ITRACONAZOLE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 13.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0006711 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [Y]EP0147171 (TOKYO TANABE CO [JP]); | [A]EP0197571 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [A]WO9405263 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al); | [Y]WO9416700 (SEPRACOR INC [US], et al); | [A]WO9416733 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al); | [A]WO9531178 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al); | [A]WO9718839 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 125, No. 26, 23 December 1996, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), page 708, Abstract No. 338841t, de CHASTEIGNER S. et al., "Comparative Study of the Association of Itraconazole with Colloidal Drug Carriers"; & DRUG DEV. RES., 1996, 38(2), 125-133. |