Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001519456 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU745155B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2002 | B2 | AU7944198 | 27.04.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1036837 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2004 | B1 | EP1036837 | 16.10.2002 | A4 | EP1036837 | 20.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE260329T | 15.03.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG63947B | 31.07.2003 | B1 | BG104301 | 29.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9812885 | 08.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2306852 | 15.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69821975T | 16.12.2004 | T2 | DE69821975D1 | 01.04.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU222844 | 29.12.2003 | B1 | HUP0003868 | 28.05.2001 | A3 | HUP0003868 | 28.02.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20001832L | 08.06.2000 | L | NO20001832D0 | 07.04.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA45499 | 15.04.2002 | C2 | Priority number | Date | RU9800146 | 18.05.1998 | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9918172 | Global Dossier | 08.07.1999 | A8 | WO9918172 | 15.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100438847B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2004 | B1 | KR20010031011 | 16.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1163571C | 25.08.2004 | C | CN1274384 | 22.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ291301 | 15.01.2003 | B6 | CZ20001204 | 17.01.2001 | A3 | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2216291T | 16.10.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL339810 | 02.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1036837E | 30.07.2004 | E | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2119524 | 27.09.1998 | C1 | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200000943T | 21.10.2002 | T2 | Priority number | Date | RU97117379 | 08.10.1997 |