EP1036837 - UNIT FOR SUPPLYING A COKE-DEPOSIT INHIBITOR SOLUTION IN TUBE FURNACES USED FOR THE PYROLYSIS OF RAW HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forest Star International Ltd. Akara Bldg., 24 De Castro Street, Wickhams Cay I Road Town Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Forest Star International Ltd. Akara Bldg., 24 De Castro Street, Wickhams Cay I Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Forest Star International Ltd. Akara Bldg., 24 De Castro Street, Wickams Cay I Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHUEV, Vladimir Andreevich ul. Kukhmisterova, 12/23-281 Moscow, 109388 / RU | 02 /
ZEMTSOV, Jury Sergeevich ul. Vilisa Latsisa, 11-4-426 Moscow, 123480 / RU | [2004/06] |
Former [2000/38] | 01 /
BUSHUEV, Vladimir Andreevich ul. Kukhmisterova, 12/23-281 Moscow, 109388 / RU | ||
02 /
ZEMTSOV, Jurii Sergeevich ul. Vilisa Latsisa, 11-4-426 Moscow, 123480 / RU | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98929942.5 | 18.05.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998RU00146 | Priority number, date | RU19970117379 | 08.10.1997 Original published format: RU 97117379 | [2000/38] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918172 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036837 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1036837 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 15.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10G9/16, B01J19/00 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
C10G9/16 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2000/38] | C10G9/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | EINHEIT ZUR ABGABE VON LÖSUNGEN VON KOKSABLAGERUNGEN IN ROHRÖFEN, VERWENDUNG BEI PYROLYSE VON ROH-KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | [2000/38] | English: | UNIT FOR SUPPLYING A COKE-DEPOSIT INHIBITOR SOLUTION IN TUBE FURNACES USED FOR THE PYROLYSIS OF RAW HYDROCARBONS | [2000/38] | French: | UNITE PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE UNE SOLUTION D'INHIBITEUR DE DEPOTS DE COKE DANS DES FOURS A TUBE SERVANT A LA PYROLYSE D'HYDROCARBURES BRUTS | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2000 | Translation filed | 07.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 07.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 13.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 25.02.2004 | CY | 25.02.2004 | FI | 25.02.2004 | LI | 25.02.2004 | IE | 18.05.2004 | LU | 18.05.2004 | DK | 25.05.2004 | GR | 25.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/24] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
IE | 18.05.2004 | ||
LU | 18.05.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LU | 18.05.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
DK | 25.05.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | CH | 25.02.2004 | |
FI | 25.02.2004 | ||
LI | 25.02.2004 | ||
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 25.02.2004 | |
GR | 25.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 25.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0617112 (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) [AD] 1-5 * figures 1-5; claims 1-5,10,11,19,20 * * column 1, lines 25-40 * * column 2, lines 32-36 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 16 * * column 6, lines 38-44 * * column 7, lines 3-11 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 15 *; | [AD]US5435904 (REED LARRY E [US], et al) [AD] 1-5 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 31 * * column 6, lines 10-30 *; | [E]WO9855563 (ATF RESOURCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-5 * figures 1A,1B,3 * * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 16 * * page 20, line 26 - page 21, line 10 ** page 22, lines 6-18 * | International search | [A]SU633892 (MUKHINA TAMARA N [SU], et al); | [A]SU843785 (NEDERLANDSE GASUNIE NV [NL]); | [A]US4708787 (PETERS ALBERT W [US], et al); | [A]EP0606898 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [A]EP0617112 (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) |