blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976290

EP0976290 - CHANNEL ALLOCATION FOR MIXED MULTISLOT SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.11.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.01.2003  [2003/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / OLOFSSON, H kan
Ringvägen 50
S-118 67 Stockholm / SE
02 / HARTMAN, Magnus
Kungsgatan 75A
S-170 70 Solna / SE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98930002.516.06.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998SE01167
Priority number, dateUS1997088074323.06.1997         Original published format: US 880743
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9859517
Date:30.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976290
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38
[2000/05]
CPC:
H04W72/0453 (EP,US); H04W72/563 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/05]
TitleGerman:KANALZUWEISUNG FÜR GEMISCHTE MEHRFACHZEITSCHLITZDIENSTE[2000/05]
English:CHANNEL ALLOCATION FOR MIXED MULTISLOT SERVICES[2000/05]
French:AFFECTATION DE CANAUX POUR UN MELANGE DE SERVICES A MULTI-CRENEAU[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase26.11.1999National basic fee paid 
26.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
26.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
21.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4785450  (BOLGIANO DUANE R [US], et al) [A] 1,18,35 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 35 *;
 [A]  - IVANOVICH M ET AL, "CHANNEL ALLOCATION METHODS FOR HALF AND FULL RATE CONNECTIONS IN GSM", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), CONVERGING TECHNOLOGIES FOR TOMORROW'S APPLICATIONS DALLAS, JUNE 23 - 27, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL & ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960623), vol. 3 OF 3, pages 1756 - 1760, XP000625108 [A] 1,11,35 * page 1757, paragraph IIIC - paragraph IIIE *
 [A]  - IERA A ET AL, "TRANSPORT AND CONTROL ISSUES IN MULTIMEDIA WIRELESS NETWORKS", WIRELESS NETWORKS, (199608), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 249 - 261, XP000625343 [A] 1,18,35 * page 253, column L, line 5 - line 22 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01201058
 [A]  - RAPPAPORT S S ET AL, "PRIORITIZED RESOURCE ASSIGNEMENT FOR MOBILE CELLULAR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH MIXED SERVICES AND PLATFORM TYPES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, (199608), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 443 - 458, XP000632289

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.533760
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.