EP1010361 - MICROFABRICATED HIGH ASPECT RATIO DEVICE WITH ELECTRICAL ISOLATION AND INTERCONNECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland California 94612-3350 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3350 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROSNIHAN, Timothy, J. University of California at Berkeley 497 Cory Hall Berkeley, CA 94720 / US | 02 /
BUSTILLO, James University of California at Berkeley 497 Cory Hall Berkeley, CA 94720 / US | 03 /
CLARK, William, A. 35624 Terrace Drive Fremont, CA 94526 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/25] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al Dibb Lupton Alsop Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 1RZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930171.8 | 12.06.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US12247 | Priority number, date | US19970874568 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: US 874568 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9857529 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010361 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
G01P15/097 (EP,US);
B81C1/00246 (EP,US);
G01C19/5719 (EP,US);
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
G01P15/0888 (EP,US);
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | H05K1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2000/25] | Title | German: | MIKROHERGESTELLTE HOCHASPEKTVERHÄLTNIS-VORRICHTUNG MIT ELEKTRISCHER ISOLATION UND ZWISCHENVERBINDUNGEN | [2000/25] | English: | MICROFABRICATED HIGH ASPECT RATIO DEVICE WITH ELECTRICAL ISOLATION AND INTERCONNECTIONS | [2000/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF MICROFABRIQUE A RAPPORT DIMENSIONNEL ELEVE AVEC ISOLATION ET INTERCONNEXIONS ELECTRIQUES | [2000/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 10.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9508775 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,13-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US5569852 (MAREK JIRI [DE], et al) [A] 1-23* figure - *; | [X]US5627317 (OFFENBERG MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,13-22 * column W *; | [PX]EP0822578 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [PX] 1-6,13-15 * figure - * | International search | [X]US3725671 (KEISTER F, et al); | [A]US4049903 (KOBLER ROBERT JAMES); | [X]US4764644 (REISMAN ARNOLD [US], et al) |