EP0995144 - ANAMORPHIC SCAN LENS FOR LASER SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etec Systems, Inc. 26460 Corporate Avenue Hayward, CA 94545 / US | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMKIN, John, M. 11306 N. Copper Springs Trail Oro Valley, AZ 85737 / US | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98930259.1 | 19.06.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998US12464 | Priority number, date | US19970002800P | 08.07.1997 Original published format: US 2800 P | US19980082433 | 20.05.1998 Original published format: US 82433 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903012 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995144 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/12, G02B27/00, G03F7/20 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
G03F7/704 (EP);
G02B26/12 (KR);
G02B26/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | ANAMORPHOTISCHE ABTASTLINSE FÜR LASERABTASTER | [2000/17] | English: | ANAMORPHIC SCAN LENS FOR LASER SCANNER | [2000/17] | French: | OBJECTIF DE BALAYAGE ANAMORPHOSEUR POUR LECTEUR LASER | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2000 | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH08160337 ; | [X]EP0465136 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 28 * abstract *; | [A]US5168386 (GALBRAITH LEE K [US]) [A] 1-3,10,17,25* column 6, line 13 - line 16; figure 5 *; | [XA]US5220449 (KURODA MUNEO [JP]) [X] 28 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - line 63 * [A] 10,17,25; | [XA]EP0661573 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 28 * page 3, line 26 - line 32 * * page 4, line 49 - page 5, line 27; figures 7,8 * [A] 1-3; | [XA]EP0694802 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,28 * page 6, line 43 - line L; figures 1,2 * [A] 10,17,25; | [XA]US5572353 (IIZUKA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,28 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - line 22 * [A] 5,10,17,28 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, & JP08160337 A 19960621 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,28 * abstract * [A] 10,17,25 |