EP0993367 - METHOD AND MACHINE FOR MAKING WOUND CARTON TUBES, AND TUBES THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKJERN PAPIRFABRIK A/S Birkvej 14 6900 Skjern / DK | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNUDSEN, Finn Klosterv nget 16 DK-6900 Skjern / DK | 02 /
MARKUSSEN, Keld S nderk r 3 DK-7400 Herning / DK | 03 /
ANDERSEN, Lone Nordre Strandvej 162A DK-3140 lsg rde / DK | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Roerboel, Leif, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S, Vester Sogade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 98930654.3 | 01.07.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998DK00293 | Priority number, date | EP19970110702 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97110702 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901276 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993367 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993367 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B31C3/00, B31C11/04, B05C1/16 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B31C3/00 (EP);
B31C11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GEWICKELTEN KARTONROHREN UND SO HERGESTELLTEN ROHREN | [2000/16] | English: | METHOD AND MACHINE FOR MAKING WOUND CARTON TUBES, AND TUBES THEREFROM | [2000/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE TUBES EN CARTON, APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE TUBES EN CARTON PAR APPLICATION DU PROCEDE ET CORPS TUBULAIRE PRODUIT PAR APPLICATION DU PROCEDE | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.2002 | BE | 03.04.2002 | CH | 03.04.2002 | FI | 03.04.2002 | FR | 03.04.2002 | GR | 03.04.2002 | IT | 03.04.2002 | LI | 03.04.2002 | NL | 03.04.2002 | IE | 01.07.2002 | DK | 03.07.2002 | GB | 03.07.2002 | PT | 03.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
FI | 03.04.2002 | ||
FR | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
FI | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/21] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
GB | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
BE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
FR | 03.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
IE | 01.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
PT | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
GR | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
CH | 03.04.2002 | ||
LI | 03.04.2002 | ||
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2641416 (MCCLEARY JASON L, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 37 ** figure 1 *; | [A]FR1301954 (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS A H MON) [A] 1,3,4,9,12-14 * page 1, paragraph L - page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]GB1169973 (BERISFORDS LTD) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 96 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 29 - line 35 * * figures -. *; | [A]US3524779 (MASTERS JOHN EDMUND, et al) [A] 1,3,4,9,12-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - line 14 * * column 5, line 12 - line 17 *; | [A]US3839122 (CURRENT J, et al) [A] 6-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 21 *; | [A]GB1419647 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1,13 * page 4, line 83 - line 95 * * figure - *; | [A]US4105824 (MONTE ROBERT W) [A] 6-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - line 53 *; | [A]DD289971 (VERPACKUNG FORSCHZENT [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE9107254U (MAUSER-WERKE GMBH) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * figures 1-3 * |