14.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
02.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
10.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
03.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
29.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] |
04.04.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] |
21.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
28.02.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
07.02.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
17.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
15.02.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
04.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.05.2001 |
First examination report |
|
02.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.03.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] |
03.03.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] |
14.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|