Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8101998 | Global Dossier | 25.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DK9800293 | 01.07.1998 | EP97110702 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0993367 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2002 | B1 | EP0993367 | 19.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DK9800293 | 01.07.1998 | EP97110702 | 01.07.1997 | EP98930654 | 01.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE215441T | 15.04.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DK9800293 | 01.07.1998 | EP97110702 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69804615T | 24.10.2002 | T2 | DE69804615D1 | 08.05.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DK9800293 | 01.07.1998 | EP97110702 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9901276 | Global Dossier | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110702 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0888877 | Global Dossier | 07.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110702 | 01.07.1997 |