blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0983182

EP0983182 - REACTION DEVICE ON A SERVO VALVE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.11.2001 [2001/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mercedes-Benz Lenkungen GmbH
Rather Strasse 51
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/10]
Inventor(s)01 / BREUNING, Edwin
Türlengasse 7
D-73770 Denkendorf / DE
02 / KÖHLER, Karl-Hans
Keplerstrasse 6
D-73249 Wernau / DE
03 / LANGKAMP, Bernd
Probststrasse 37/1
D-73669 Lichtenwald / DE
04 / SCHICK, Bernd
Karlstrasse 13
D-73650 Winterbach / DE
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Dahmen, Toni, et al
DaimlerChrysler AG, FTP, C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Dahmen, Toni, Dipl.-Ing., et al
DaimlerChrysler AG, FTP, C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date98930693.115.05.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998EP02881
Priority number, dateDE199712175524.05.1997         Original published format: DE 19721755
[2000/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9852812
Date:26.11.1998
Language:DE
[1998/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983182
Date:08.03.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:B62D5/083, B62D6/02
[2000/10]
CPC:
B62D5/083 (EP,KR); B62D6/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   PT [2000/10]
TitleGerman:RÜCKWIRKUNGSANORDNUNG AN EINER SERVOVENTILANORDNUNG[2000/10]
English:REACTION DEVICE ON A SERVO VALVE ARRANGEMENT[2000/10]
French:SYSTEME DE RETROACTION SUR UN SYSTEME DE SERVO-VALVE[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase26.10.1999National basic fee paid 
26.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
03.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
20.09.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0749889  (TRW FAHRWERKSYST GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 5, line 13 - line 44; figure -; claims 2,10 *;
 [X]JPS588468  ;
 [A]GB2235171  (TRW CAM GEARS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4315895  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0369311  (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830405), vol. 7, no. 81, Database accession no. (M - 205), & JP58008468 A 19830118 (NIPPON SEIKO) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.