EP0922185 - HUMIDIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JS Humidifiers PLC Rustington Trading Estate, Artex Avenue Rustington, West Sussex BN16 3LN / GB | [1999/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERNEY, Stephen, Palmer 67 Sea Avenue Rustington West Sussex BN16 2DP / GB | 02 /
FLEMING, Anthony 20 Henley Road Southsea Hampshire PO4 0HS / GB | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Hutchins, Michael Richard FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930961.2 | 30.06.1998 | [1999/24] | WO1998GB01906 | Priority number, date | GB19970013785 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9713785 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901702 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922185 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F24F6/04, F24F1/02 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
F24F6/04 (EP);
F24F1/037 (EP,US);
F24F1/035 (EP,US);
F24F2221/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/24] | Title | German: | BEFEUCHTER | [1999/24] | English: | HUMIDIFIER | [1999/24] | French: | HUMIDIFICATEUR | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 24.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2441812 (XEDA INTERNATIONAL [GB]) [Y] 1-9,12,18,20,21,26,31-35 * figure 6; claim - *; | [Y]EP0194636 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [Y] 1-9,12,18,20,21,26,31-35 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4411644 (KRONAUER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-33 * abstract *; | [A]WO9513506 (SEELEY F F NOMINEES [AU])[A] 14,16; | [A]EP0661504 (NAT RES DEV [IN]) [A] 1,33 * abstract * |