EP1007787 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-LAYERED TISSUE PAPER PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANNEELS, Allison 61, avenue J.B. Depaire B-1020 Brussels / BE | 02 /
HILBIG, Klaus Hauptstrasse 129 D-65843 Sulzbach / DE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacherstrasse 40 65824 Schwalbach/Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 98930968.7 | 17.07.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998IB01092 | Priority number, date | DE1997132735 | 30.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19732735 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906634 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007787 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007787 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/22, A61K7/50, // (D21H17/07, 17:20, 17:53, 17:59) | [2000/24] | CPC: |
D21H21/22 (EP,KR);
D21F11/04 (EP);
D21F11/14 (EP);
D21H17/02 (EP);
D21H17/07 (EP);
D21H17/53 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRLAGIGEN TISSUEPAPIERPRODUKTEN | [2001/28] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-LAYERED TISSUE PAPER PRODUCTS | [2000/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ARTICLES EN PAPIER TISSUE MULTICOUCHES | [2001/28] |
Former [2000/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRSCHICHTIGEN SEIDENPAPIERPRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2000/24] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ARTICLES EN PAPIER DE SOIE MULTICOUCHES | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.07.2002 | [2004/10] | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0239910 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [AD] 1-7,10* the whole document *; | [A]WO9706307 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,4,8,10 * page 13, line 1 - line 25 * * page 20, line 26 - page 24, line 10 * * page 33, line 28 - page 37, line 23 *; | [A]US5624676 (MACKEY LARRY N [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,15,16 * | Examination | WO9309287 | WO9527429 | US5538595 |