blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0937551

EP0937551 - SHIELDED INDUSTRIAL ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.07.2002  [2002/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Aza-komanba Shibokusa, Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KINOSHITA, Satoshi, R.9-306 Fanuc Manshonharimomi
3533-2, Shibokusa, Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0511 / JP
02 / SUGIYAMA, Hideki, R.12-606, Fanuc Manshonharimomi
3513-2, Shibokusa, Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0511 / JP
[1999/34]
Representative(s)Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98931097.414.07.1998
[1999/34]
WO1998JP03155
Priority number, dateJP1997020521414.07.1997         Original published format: JP 20521497
[1999/34]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9903653
Date:28.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0937551
Date:25.08.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.01.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:B25J19/00
[1999/34]
CPC:
B25J19/0075 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE [1999/34]
TitleGerman:GESCHÜTZTER INDUSTRIE ROBOTER[1999/34]
English:SHIELDED INDUSTRIAL ROBOT[1999/34]
French:ROBOT INDUSTRIEL PROTEGE[1999/34]
Entry into regional phase22.03.1999Translation filed 
12.04.1999National basic fee paid 
12.04.1999Search fee paid 
12.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/34]
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/27]
28.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5513946  (SAWADA YASUHIRO ET AL) [A] 1-4 * column 10, line 54 - line 60 * * figure 1 *
International search[X]JPS63162188  ;
 [Y]JPS6279996
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.