EP1005372 - ANTI-CD40L IMMUNOTOXINS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanox Pharma B.V. Paasheuvelweg 15 1105 BE Amsterdam / NL | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BOER, Mark Naarderweg 20 NL-1261 BT Blaricum / NL | 02 /
DEN HARTOG, Marcel, Theodorus Jan Persijnlaan 134 NL-1141 WN Monnickendam / NL | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98931129.5 | 22.06.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998NL00357 | Priority number, date | EP19970201895 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: EP 97201895 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858678 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005372 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005372 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61P25/02, A61P19/02, A61P35/02 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6825 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/23] | A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Title | German: | ANTI-CD40L IMMUNOTOXINE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN | [2000/23] | English: | ANTI-CD40L IMMUNOTOXINS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES | [2000/23] | French: | IMMUNOTOXINES ANTI-CD40L SERVANT A TRAITER DES MALADIES | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2002 | BE | 02.01.2002 | CH | 02.01.2002 | FI | 02.01.2002 | FR | 02.01.2002 | GR | 02.01.2002 | IT | 02.01.2002 | LI | 02.01.2002 | NL | 02.01.2002 | DK | 02.04.2002 | PT | 02.04.2002 | SE | 02.04.2002 | DE | 03.04.2002 | CY | 30.06.2002 | ES | 30.07.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/32] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
BE | 02.01.2002 | ||
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
FR | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
DE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CY | 30.06.2002 | ||
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
BE | 02.01.2002 | ||
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
DE | 03.04.2002 | ||
CY | 30.06.2002 | ||
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
BE | 02.01.2002 | ||
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
DE | 03.04.2002 | ||
ES | 30.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
BE | 02.01.2002 | ||
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
DK | 02.04.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
DE | 03.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
BE | 02.01.2002 | ||
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
DE | 03.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
BE | 02.01.2002 | ||
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
GR | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 02.01.2002 | |
BE | 02.01.2002 | ||
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 02.01.2002 | |
CH | 02.01.2002 | ||
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
PT | 02.04.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 02.01.2002 | |
FI | 02.01.2002 | ||
LI | 02.01.2002 | ||
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 02.01.2002 | |
NL | 02.01.2002 | ||
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | NL | 02.01.2002 | |
SE | 02.04.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 02.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0555880 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 22-34 * * column 7, lines 40-54 * * column 12, lines 43-47 * [Y] 1-5,7-17; | [DY]WO9426910 (XOMA CORP [US], et al) [DY] 1-5,7-17 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 15; examples 7,14-17 *; | [XY]US5474771 (LEDERMAN SETH [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 15-23 * * column 7, lines 54-58 * * column 13, lines 35-57 * [Y] 1-5,7-17; | [XY]WO9623071 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 11 * * page 5, lines 11-30 * * page 10, lines 20-28 * * page 23, lines 10-13; claims 85-87,99,104-106 * [Y] 1-5,7-17; | [A]WO9717446 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PY] - FRANCISCO J.A. ET AL., "Construction, Expression, and Characterization of BD1-G28-5 sFv, a Single Chain Anti-CD40 Immunotoxin Containing the Ribosome-inactivating Protein Bryodin 1", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (199709), vol. 272, no. 39, pages 24165 - 24169, XP002081655 [PY] 1-5,7-17 * page 24165 * * See discussion, pages 24168-24169 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.39.24165 | [A] - FRANCISCO, J.A ET AL., "In Vivo Efficacy and Toxicity of a Single-Chain Immunotoxin Targeted to CD40", BLOOD, (19970615), pages 4493 - 4500, XP002081656 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - PREIJERS F W, "Rationale for the clinical use of immunotoxins: monoclonal antibodies conjugated to ribosome -inactivating proteins.", LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA, (1993 MAR) 9 (4-5) 293-304. REF: 101 JOURNAL CODE: BNQ. ISSN: 1042-8194., Switzerland, XP002081657 [A] 4-6 * the whole document * | [DA] - GERRITSE K ET AL, "CD40 - CD40 ligand interactions in experimental allergic encephalomyelitis and multiple sclerosis.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1996 MAR 19) 93 (6) 2499-504. JOURNAL CODE: PV3. ISSN: 0027-8424., United States, XP002081658 [DA] 14-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.6.2499 |