EP1049898 - PRESSURIZED, CLOSED LUBRICATION AND HYDRAULIC OIL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wiklund, Thore Ringgatan 16 941 36 Pitea / SE | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB, Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 98931192.3 | 01.07.1998 | [2000/45] | WO1998SE01300 | Priority number, date | SE19980000234 | 28.01.1998 Original published format: SE 9800234 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9939127 | Date: | 05.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1049898 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16N7/14, F16N11/04, F16N11/10, F15B15/04 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
F15B15/149 (EP);
F16C11/0614 (EP);
F16C23/045 (EP);
F16C33/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [2000/45] | Title | German: | GESCHLOSSENES UND UNTER DRUCK STEHENDES SCHMIERSYSTEM UND HYDRAULIKÖLSYSTEM | [2000/45] | English: | PRESSURIZED, CLOSED LUBRICATION AND HYDRAULIC OIL SYSTEM | [2000/45] | French: | LUBRIFICATION SOUS PRESSION ET FERMEE ET SYSTEME D'HUILE HYDRAULIQUE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 27.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/04] | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2293167 (OVERBEKE JOHN W); | [Y]US3678810 (HOLMES LLOYD H, et al); | [Y]GB1185718 (YOUNG ROY WHEELER [US]); | [Y]WO9203684 (KASSELL ANTHONY [GB]) |