EP0991625 - INHIBITORS OF FACTOR XA WITH A NEUTRAL P1 SPECIFICITY GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company Lawrenceville-Princeton Road P.O. Box 4000 Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company Lawrenceville-Princeton Road P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, New Jersey 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Pharma Company 203 Longmeadow Drive Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Dupont Pharmaceuticals Company Chestnut Run Plaza, 974 Centre Road Wilmington, DE 19805 / US | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALEMMO, Robert, Anthony, Jr. 3039 Stump Hall Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 02 /
DOMINGUEZ, Celia 963 Cedar Cliff Court Westlake Village, CA 91320 / US | 03 /
FEVIG, John, Matthew 987 Church Road Lincoln University, PA 19352 / US | 04 /
HAN, Qi 2609 Marhill Drive Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | 05 /
LAM, Patrick, Yuk-Sun 6 Ridgeway Drive Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 06 /
PINTO, Donald, Joseph, Philip 39 Whitson Road Newark, DE 19702 / US | 07 /
PRUITT, James, Russell 237 Skycrest Drive Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 08 /
QUAN, Mimi, Lifen 113 Venus Drive Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2000/15] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98931355.6 | 18.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US12681 | Priority number, date | US19970878885 | 19.06.1997 Original published format: US 878885 | US19980076691P | 27.02.1998 Original published format: US 76691 P | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9857937 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0991625 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991625 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP);
C07D213/16 (KR);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07D231/14 (EP);
C07D277/56 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Extension states | LT | 22.11.1999 | LV | 22.11.1999 | RO | 22.11.1999 | SI | 22.11.1999 | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DES FAKTORS XA MIT EINER NEUTRALEN GRUPPE MIT P1-SPEZIFITÄT | [2000/15] | English: | INHIBITORS OF FACTOR XA WITH A NEUTRAL P1 SPECIFICITY GROUP | [2000/15] | French: | INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR Xa COMPRENANT UN GROUPE A SPECIFICITE P1 NEUTRE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.05.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE Pochart, François C/o Cabinet Hirsch & Associés 58 Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE Pochart, François 58 Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | 05.04.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.05.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.09.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2009 | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.08.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.08.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/52] | Request for further processing for: | 10.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.10.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | LU | 18.06.2006 | IE | 19.06.2006 | GB | 18.06.2011 | IT | 18.06.2011 | ES | 19.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | DE | 03.01.2012 | GR | 05.01.2012 | [2015/21] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
LU | 18.06.2006 | ||
IE | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
IE | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2701091 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG) [A] 1-4* see table I, page 11, compounds no. 20-27 *; | [X]EP0015140 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 1 * example 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US4226877 (ARENDSEN DAVID L) [A] 1-4,8 * see table I, compound V; column 3, lines 7-13; claims 1,9 *; | [X]DE3420985 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * see table 1, page 13, fourth compound from the bottom; page 14, fourth compound;; claim 1 *; | [X]GB2149402 (LILLY CO ELI) [X] 1-4 * see examples 82,83,86-91,110,113,131,136 *; | [X]DE3540839 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE3633840 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * see table I, examples no. 38, 59-61, 91, 100, 103, 110, 247;; claim 1 *; | [X]DE3706993 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0289879 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * see table 1, page 20, compound 58; page 27, compound 139; table 2, page 30, compound 162 *; | [X]EP0333131 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * see table I, page 9, examples 40-46,59, page 11, examples 100-106,119, page 13, examples 160-166,179, page 15, examples 220-226,239, page 17, examples 280-286, 299, page 19, examples 340-346,359, * * page 25, examples 520-526,539, page 27, examples 580-586,599, page 41, examples 1000-1006,1019 *; | [X]EP0418845 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,8 * page 2, line 1 - line 22; claims 1,2,9-11 *; | [X]DE4013723 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 9, line 62 - page 10, line 19; claim 1; table A *; | [AD]EP0513387 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,8 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 47; claim 1 *; | [X]US5262412 (ASHTON WALLACE T [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * claims 1,2,4 *; | [AD]WO9402477 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [AD] 1,8 * claims 1,8-10 *; | [Y]WO9514683 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [Y] 1-4,8 * page 206 - page 266; claims 1,30 *; | [Y]WO9514682 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [Y] 1-4,8 * abstract * * page 36 - page 38 * * claims 1,7 *; | [DY]WO9518111 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [DY] 1-4,8 * page 147 - page 171; claims 1,11,22 *; | [X]DE4405207 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * examples 2,14,26; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5446056 (WITYAK JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,8 * abstract *; | [DY]US5463071 (HIMMELSBACH FRANK [DE], et al) [DY] 1-4,8 * column 23, line 1 - column 24, line 25; example -; claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9628427 (BERLEX LAB [US], et al) [AD] 1,8 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9637482 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [Y] 1-4,8 * abstract *; | [DY]WO9638426 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [DY] 1-4,8 * page 188 - page 286; claims 1,49 * | by applicant | EP0028489 | EP0293881 | EP0471651 | US5187157 | WO9514682 | US5446056 | WO9637482 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1985), page 1418 | - The Chemistry of Heterocyclic Compounds, JOHN WILEY & SONS | - The Chemistry of Heterocyclic Compounds, Weissberger, JOHN WILEY & SONS | - DUNCIA, J. ORG. CHEM., (1991), pages 2395 - 2400 | - THOMAS, SYNTHESIS, (1993), pages 767 - 768 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, pages 32 - 35 | - BIOORG. & MED. CHEM. LETT., (1996), vol. 6, pages 1015 - 1020 | - WEINREB, TETR. LETT., (1977), vol. 48, pages 4171 - 4174 | - CHEM. BER., (1961), vol. 94, page 1116 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1976), vol. 41, page 1073 | - J. CHEM. SOC., (1935), page 899 | - TETR, (1974), vol. 30, page 409 | - CHEM. BER., (1979), vol. 112, page 1206 | - REGEL, E. ET AL., LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1977), page 145 | - REGEL,E. ET AL., LIEBIGS ANN: CHEM., (1977), page 145 | - KETTNER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 18289 - 18297 |