EP1002126 - IMPROVED METHOD FOR ISOLATING AND RECOVERING TARGET DNA OR RNA MOLECULES HAVING A DESIRED NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVITROGEN CORPORATION 1600 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Invitrogen Corporation 1600 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Life Technologies, Inc. 9800 Medical Center Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Wu-bo 11909 Riding Loop Terrace North Potomac, MD 20878 / US | 02 /
JESSE, Joel 4139 Old National Pike Mt. Airy, MD 21771 / US | 03 /
NISSON, Paul 9504 Appeals Place Gaithersburg, MD 20879 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [2000/21] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire European Patent Attorneys, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98931513.0 | 24.06.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998US13043 | Priority number, date | US19970050729P | 25.06.1997 Original published format: US 50729 P | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859075 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002126 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, C12Q1/68 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C12N15/1013 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6813 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6813, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2525/179 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/21] | C12Q1/68, G01N33/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Extension states | AL | 17.12.1999 | LT | 17.12.1999 | LV | 17.12.1999 | MK | 17.12.1999 | RO | 17.12.1999 | SI | 17.12.1999 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG UND WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON ZIEL-DNA ODER -RNA MOLEKÜLEN MIT EINER GEWÜNSCHTEN NUKLEOTIDSEQUENZ | [2000/21] | English: | IMPROVED METHOD FOR ISOLATING AND RECOVERING TARGET DNA OR RNA MOLECULES HAVING A DESIRED NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE | [2000/21] | French: | PROCEDE PERFECTIONNE PERMETTANT D'ISOLER ET RECUPERER DES MOLECULES CIBLES D'ADN OU ARN PRESENTANT UNE SEQUENCE DE NUCLEOTIDES SOUHAITEE | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2733515 (CIS BIO INT [FR]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * claims 1,4,15,24,25 * * page 12 - page 14 * * figure 4 *; | [X]DE4411588 (DEUTSCHES RHEUMA FORSCHUNGSZEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * claims 1,6,12 * * page 2, line 47 - line 53 * * page 3, column 15 - column 65 *; | [XY]EP0773225 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,2,6,11 * [Y] 9-20,23-40; | [Y]US5500356 (LI WU-BO [US], et al) [Y] 9-40 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * abstract * * column 4 * * column 7, paragraph 1 * * column 8, paragraph 6 * * column 9 - column 11 *; | [Y]WO9720918 (RECOMBINANT BIOCATALYSIS INC [US]) [Y] 21,22 * page 47, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]WO9509915 (NBL GENE SCIENCES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 21,22 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [XY] - ASLANYAN ET AL., "CONFORMATION AND THERMAL STABILITY OF DNA IN AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS OF BETA-ALANINE AND GAMMA-AMINOBUTYRIC ACID", BIOPHYSICS, (1984), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 615 - 620, XP002277606 [X] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-20,23-40 | [XY] - SMOL'YANINOVA T I ET AL, "MODEL STUDY OF DNA-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS I. THE INFLUENCE OF AMINO-CARBOXYLATE AND AMIDE GROUPS OF AMINO-ACIDS ON DNA THERMOSTABILITY AND CONFORMATION", MOLEKULYARNAYA BIOLOGIYA (MOSCOW), (1985), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 0026-8984, pages 992 - 1000, XP002277456 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 9-20,23-40 | [T] - CHADALAVADA, "DNA helix destabilization by proline and betaine: possible role in the salinity tolerance process", FEBS LETTERS, (19970630), vol. 410, pages 201 - 205, XP002277457 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)00588-7 | International search | [A]US5165925 (LEONG JO-ANN C [US]); | [A]US5350672 (OBERST RICHARD D [US], et al); | [A] - "LIFE TECHNOLOGIES PRODUCT CATALOGUE AND REFERENCE GUIDE", LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CATALOGUE AND REFERENCE GUIDE, XX, XX, XX, (19950101), pages 19 - 10 + 19, XP002910267 |