EP0985025 - PHOSPHATE-BUILT DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMERY, William, Derek Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside L63 3JW / GB | 02 /
INSTONE, Terry Unilever Research Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside L63 3JW / GB | 03 /
LIEM, Seeng, Djiang Unilever Research Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 04 /
VERSCHELLING, Gilbert, Martin Unilever Research Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/49] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever PLC Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | Fransella, Mary Evelyn, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/11] | Baker, Colin John Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932067.6 | 11.05.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998EP02984 | Priority number, date | GB19970011352 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: GB 9711352 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854287 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985025 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/06, C11D3/06 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D1/66 (EP);
C11D17/06 (EP);
C11D17/065 (EP);
C11D3/06 (EP);
C11D3/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/11] | Title | German: | WASHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND PHOSPHATHALTIGE BUILDER | [2000/11] | English: | PHOSPHATE-BUILT DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS | [2000/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES A ADJUVANT PHOSPHATE | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/11] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1560073 (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * page 1, line 25 - page 5, line 30; example 1 *; | [A]US4283299 (BECKER GERT, et al) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 38 - column 7, line 29; example 1 *; | [A]EP0220024 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-5,8,9 * page 2, line 45 - page 4, line 25; example 1 *; | [A]US4828721 (BOLLIER MARC M P [BE], et al) [A] 1,2,8 * column 14, line 42 - column 16, line 65 *; | [X]US5482646 (MAZZOLA LOUIS R [US]) [X] 1,2,6-10 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 30; example 1 *; | [A]US5633224 (PORTER TERRENCE J [US]) [A] 1-5,7-9 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 50 ** column 6, line 4 - column 9, line 49; example 1 * |