EP0991786 - SEPARATING METAL IONS ABSORBED ON A RESIN AND INSTALLATION FOR RECYCLING PHOTOGRAPHIC EFFLUENTS INCLUDING AN EXCHANGER AND AN ELECTROLYSIS VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gasser, Gérard 77, rue de Kingersheim 68270 Wittenheim / FR | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Nuss, Pierre, et al 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98932197.1 | 12.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998FR01242 | Priority number, date | FR19970007812 | 19.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9707812 | [2000/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859081 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991786 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991786 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/00, C22B11/12, C22B3/42, C22B3/24, C25C1/20, G03C5/395 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C25C1/20 (EP,US);
B01J49/30 (EP,US);
G03C5/395 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | ABTRENNUNG VON AUF HARZ ABSORBIERTEN METALLIONEN UND ANLAGE MIT IONENAUSTAUSCHER UND ELEKTROLYSEZELLE ZUR REGENERIERENDEN AUFARBEITUNG FOTOGRAFISCHER BÄDER | [2000/15] | English: | SEPARATING METAL IONS ABSORBED ON A RESIN AND INSTALLATION FOR RECYCLING PHOTOGRAPHIC EFFLUENTS INCLUDING AN EXCHANGER AND AN ELECTROLYSIS VESSEL | [2000/15] | French: | SEPARATION D'IONS METALLIQUES ABSORBES SUR UNE RESINE ET INSTALLATION DE RECYCLAGE D'EFFLUENTS PHOTOGRAPHIQUES INCLUANT UN ECHANGEUR ET UNE CUVE A ELECTROLYSE | [2000/47] |
Former [2000/15] | SEPARATION D'IONS METALLIQUES ABSORBES SUR UNE RESINE ET INSTALLATION DE RECYCLAGE D'EFFLUENTS PHOTOGRAPHIQUES INCLUYANT UN ECHANGEUR ET UNE CUVE A ELECTROLYSE | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 08.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.09.2001 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 12.10.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2001 | GB | 05.12.2001 | IE | 05.12.2001 | NL | 05.12.2001 | SE | 05.03.2002 | [2003/09] |
Former [2003/01] | GB | 05.12.2001 | |
IE | 05.12.2001 | ||
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | IE | 05.12.2001 | |
SE | 05.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 05.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6014240 ; | [A]JPS5514849 ; | [A]JPS5855542 ; | [Y]DD126856 (VEB FILMFABRIK WOLFEN) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * page 3; examples 1,2 *; | [Y]US4159930 (DEGENKOLB DAVID J, et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * examples 1,6,7; claim 16 *; | [Y]GB2054182 (KODAK LTD) [Y] 1,5,9 * page 1, line 80 - line 125; claims 1,5 *; | [Y]FR2621051 (CELI ANTONIO M [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * page 7; claims 1,7 *; | [YX]FR2666591 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * figures 1-5; examples 1-3,6; claims 1,5,6,8,10,16-19 * [X] 19-21 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850605), vol. 009, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 361), & JP60014240 A 19850124 (TEIJIN ENGINEERING KK) [A] 5,19-22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800403), vol. 004, no. 042, Database accession no. (C - 005), & JP55014849 A 19800201 (TEIJIN ENG KK) [A] 5,19-22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830622), vol. 007, no. 143, Database accession no. (C - 172), & JP58055542 A 19830401 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU KK) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | Examination | WO9012898 |