EP0993314 - SYRINGE AND CAPSULE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PowderJect Research Limited 4 Robert Robinson Avenue, The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states PowderJect Research Limited 4 Robert Robinson Avenue, The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTTER, Charles, David, Ogilvy Denham House, Church End Stardlake OX8 7SG / GB | 02 /
POTTER, David, S. 2 Cliff Road, Cowes Isle of Wight PO31 8BN / GB | 03 /
BELLHOUSE, Brian, John The Lodge, North Street Islip, Oxfordshire OX5 2SQ / GB | 04 /
GREENFORD, John, Christopher 11 Park Crescent, Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 1DF / GB | 05 /
CARTER, Fiona 1 Howard Street Oxford OX4 3AY / GB | 06 /
WEEKES, Stuart 39 Lakefield Road, Littlemore Oxford OX4 4LZ / GB | 07 /
SHELDRAKE, Colin 253 Greys Road, Henley-on-Thames Oxford RG9 1QS / GB | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932377.9 | 06.07.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998GB01980 | Priority number, date | EP19970304909 | 04.07.1997 Original published format: EP 97304909 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901169 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993314 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993314 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/30, A61K9/48, A61M5/315, A61M5/28 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
A61M5/3015 (EP,US);
A61M5/2053 (EP,US);
A61M5/286 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | SPRITZE UND DAFÜR GEEIGNETE KAPSEL | [2000/16] | English: | SYRINGE AND CAPSULE THEREFOR | [2000/16] | French: | SERINGUE ET CAPSULE CONNEXE | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2118993 (CEGLA ULRICH) [A] 18* page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0144551 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,2,8,13-15,20,21,23 * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 32 * * page 11, lines 5-10 * * figures 2,4 *; | [XA]US5125892 (DRUDIK ARNIE [CA]) [X] 1,14 * column 3, lines 40-63 * * column 8, lines 11-22 * * column 9, lines 40-45 * * figures 1,2,9,20 * [A] 10; | [AD]WO9424263 (OXFORD BIOSCIENCES LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1,14,19,21,22 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 2 * * page 5, lines 25-35 * * page 11, line 35 - page 13, line 12 * * figures 1,5,8 *; | [A]WO9612513 (OXFORD BIOSCIENCES LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,14 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 5; figure 1 *; | [A]US5614217 (CHIPRICH TIMOTHY B [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 35-55 * * figure 2 * |