EP1004663 - PROCESS AND MICROORGANISM FOR PRODUCING PURINE NUCLEOSIDES VIA FERMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/22] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PURINE NUCLEOSIDES VIA FERMENTATION | ||
[2005/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [2007/06] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Hiroshi Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Labs. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 02 /
KAWASAKI, Hisashi Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Labs. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 03 /
SHIMAOKA, Megumi Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Labs. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 04 /
TAKENAKA, Yasuhiro Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Labs. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | 05 /
KURAHASHI, Osamu Ajinomoto Co., Inc. Central Res. Labs. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0801 / JP | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932584.0 | 17.07.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998JP03239 | Priority number, date | JP19970194603 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19460397 | [2000/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903988 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004663 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1004663 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/21, C12P19/32, C12R1/19 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C12N9/1077 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (KR);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12P19/38 (EP,US);
C12P19/40 (EP,US);
C12R2001/19 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/22] | C12N15/09, C12N1/21, C12P19/32, // C12N1:21, C12R1:19, C12P19:32, C12R1:19 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MIKROORGANISM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PURIN-NUKLEOSIDEN DURCH FERMENTATION | [2005/44] | English: | PROCESS AND MICROORGANISM FOR PRODUCING PURINE NUCLEOSIDES VIA FERMENTATION | [2005/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE NUCLEOSIDES DE PURINE PAR FERMENTATION ET MICROORGANISMES CAPABLE D' EFFECTUER CE PROCEDE | [2005/45] |
Former [2000/22] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PURIN-NUKLEOSIDEN DURCH FERMENTATION | ||
Former [2000/22] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PURINE NUCLEOSIDES VIA FERMENTATION | ||
Former [2000/22] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE NUCLEOSIDES DE PURINE PAR FERMENTATION | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2000 | Translation filed | 07.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05007365.9 / EP1577386 | EP05007366.7 / EP1584679 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [T]EP1217076 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [T] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [T]EP1004663 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [T] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0282989 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,13 * page 2 - page 3 *; | [X]EP0406436 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,13 * page 1 - page 3 * | International search | [A]WO9005784 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]JPS63230094 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK) |