EP0952189 - FLAME RETARDANT WITH RESISTANCE TO THERMAL DETERIORATION, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 305 Yashimanishi-machi Takamatsu-shi Kagawa 761-0113 / JP | [2009/26] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Kyowa Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 305 Yashimanishi-machi Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-0113 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZUKI, Keiko, Kyowa Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. Res. and Development Dept., 4285, Hayashida-cho Sakaide-shi, Kagawa 762-0012 / JP | 02 /
IMAHASHI, Takeshi, Kyowa Chemical Ind. Co., Ltd. Res. and Development Dept., 4285, Hayashida-cho Sakaide-shi, Kagawa 762-0012 / JP | 03 /
OKADA, Akira, Kyowa Chemical Ind. Co., Ltd. Res. and Development Dept., 4285, Hayashida-cho Sakaide-shi, Kagawa 762-0012 / JP | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/43] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932597.2 | 21.07.1998 | [1999/43] | WO1998JP03253 | Priority number, date | JP19970195612 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19561297 | [1999/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905219 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952189 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952189 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0952189 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/22, C08K3/26 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/43] | C08L101/00, C08K3/24, C08K9/04, C08L23/00, C08L27/00, C08K3/32, C08K3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/43] | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE MIT BESTÄNDIGKEIT GEGEN THERMISCHE ZERSETZUNG, HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMKÖRPER | [1999/43] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT WITH RESISTANCE TO THERMAL DETERIORATION, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLE | [1999/43] | French: | AGENT IGNIFUGE, RESISTANT A LA DETERIORATION THERMIQUE, COMPOSITION DE RESINE ET ARTICLE MOULE | [1999/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.1999 | Translation filed | 22.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.2005
26.08.2008
WITHDRAWN Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Heinen, Annemieke Willemine Akzo Nobel N.V. Department AIP P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.2005
26.08.2008
WITHDRAWN Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Heinen, Annemieke Willemine Akzo Nobel N.V. Department AIP P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2005/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.2005
WITHDRAWN Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Heinen, Annemieke Willemine Akzo Nobel N.V. Department AIP P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 04.11.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.09.2008 | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.09.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.05.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | BE | 29.12.2004 | CH | 29.12.2004 | ES | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | LI | 29.12.2004 | DK | 29.03.2005 | GR | 29.03.2005 | SE | 29.03.2005 | PT | 29.05.2005 | CY | 21.07.2005 | IE | 21.07.2005 | LU | 21.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
CY | 21.07.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
CY | 21.07.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
IE | 21.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
CH | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
LI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9901509 ; | [X]US4154718 (ANABUKI HITOSI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13 * column 2, line 38 - line 53; example 5; table 2 * * example 14; table 4 * * claims 1,3,7,10,15 *; | [XA]WO9322237 (HUBER CORP J M [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 9 * * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 13; example 4 * * claims 10,11 * [A] 6-13; | [A]US5484583 (GRUBBS DONALD K [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * example 2 *; | [XA]WO9623727 (RWE DEA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 19 - line 31; tables 1-3 * * Compounds 9-18 * * page 7, line 37 - page 8, line 3 * * claims 1,3,11 * [A] 6-13; | [A]EP0780425 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* page 3, line 25 - line 32 *; | [E] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 09, Database accession no. 1999-106021, XP002154297 & WO9901509 A 19990114 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD) [E] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS462280B ; | [Y]JPS5580445 (KYOWA KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [Y]JPS601241 (KYOWA KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [Y]JPS6281435 (HITACHI CABLE); | [Y]JPS63118374 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS6436654 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD) | Examination | US3650704 | Opposition | EP0061175 | US4675356 | JPH04148349 | DE19503522 | EP0933401 | - F. CAVANI ET AL., "Hydrotalcite-Type Anionic Clays: Preparation, Properties and Applications", CATALYSIS TODAY, AMSTERDAM, (1991), vol. 11, pages 173 - 301 | - ZENJIRO OOSAWA, Degradation and Stabilisation of Polymers, MUSASHINO CREATE CO., LTD.,, (19920625), page 105, ISBN 4944022026 | - JOHN DAINTITH, A Dictionary of Chemistry, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (2000), vol. 4, page 574, ISBN 0192801015 |