EP0991516 - OPTICAL DEVICES AND THEIR METHOD OF ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNDON, Reba, S. 24 Flint Road Horseheads, NY 14845 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Ronald, E. South Main Street Tioga, PA 16946 / US | 03 /
OTAIGBE, Joshua, U. 1222 Scott Avenue Ames, IA 50010 / US | 04 /
WU, Joy, C. 162 Overlook Drive Horseheads, NY 14845 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932772.1 | 16.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US12607 | Priority number, date | US19970050811P | 26.06.1997 Original published format: US 50811 P | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900246 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991516 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/04, B32B33/00, G02B5/30 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B32B33/00 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (KR);
B29D11/0073 (EP,US);
G02B5/3025 (EP,US);
B29C65/4825 (EP,US);
B29C65/4835 (EP,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,US);
B29C65/4855 (EP,US);
B29C65/5007 (EP,US);
B29C65/5057 (EP,US);
B29C66/45 (EP,US);
B29C66/7465 (EP,US);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2027/12 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
B29K2081/06 (EP,US);
B29K2309/08 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0034 (EP,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,US);
B32B2429/02 (EP,US);
G02F2202/28 (EP,US);
G11B7/256 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | B32B7/04, B32B33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/15] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN MONTAGE | [2000/15] | English: | OPTICAL DEVICES AND THEIR METHOD OF ASSEMBLY | [2000/15] | French: | DISPOSITIFS OPTIQUES ET LEURS PROCEDES D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 02.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4075386 (WILLDORF MICHAEL E) |