EP1000426 - DYNAMIC MAINTENANCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invensys Systems, Inc. 33 Commercial Street Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2006/38] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states THE FOXBORO COMPANY 33 Commercial Street Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINES, Caroline, J. 3 Fletcher Street Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | 02 /
KOMARLA, Sharath 422 Mystic avenue Somerville, Masachusetts 02145 / US | 03 /
LEROY, Houghton, S., Jr. 22 Bishop Road Rochester, MA 02770 / US | 04 /
MCGUIRE, Richard, A. 11 Whitney Lane Upton, MA 01562 / US | [2000/24] |
Former [2000/20] | 01 /
VINES, Caroline, J. 3 Fletcher Street Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | ||
02 /
KOMARLA, Sharath 2304 Village Road West Norwood, MA 02062 / US | |||
03 /
LEROY, Houghton, S., Jr. 22 Bishop Road Rochester, MA 02770 / US | |||
04 /
MCGUIRE, Richard, A. 11 Whitney Lane Upton, MA 01562 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Peterreins, Frank, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932891.9 | 25.06.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998US13317 | Priority number, date | US19970901847 | 28.07.1997 Original published format: US 901847 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905684 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000426 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000426 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G21C7/36, G05B19/418 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G05B19/4184 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32226 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32234 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | G21C7/36 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES INSTANDHALTUNG VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2000/20] | English: | DYNAMIC MAINTENANCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2000/20] | French: | SYSTEME DYNAMIQUE DE GESTION DE L'ENTRETIEN | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07076011.1 / EP1895376 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2000 | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2001 | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 07.06.2004 | ID: | 02 | For: | DE DK FR GB | Date: | 27.07.2006 | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/47] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Date: | 07.06.2004 | ||
[2006/39] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | [2012/20] |
Former [2011/47] | DK | 01.12.2010 | |
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | NL | 01.12.2010 | |
SE | 01.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5548535 (ZVONAR JOHN G [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,14-18 * column 4, line 51 - column 15, line 3; figures 1-20 * [A] 8,12,13 | International search | [X]US5311562 (PALUSAMY SAM S [US], et al) |