EP0994845 - METHOD OF MAKING METHYLAMINES USING CHABAZITE CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBIN, David, Richard 835 Lenape Road West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 02 /
LOBO, Raul, Francisco 317 Cannon's Way Newark, DE 19713 / US | 03 /
SCHWARZ, Stephan 507 Falkirk Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/17] | Kuhnen, Rainer Andreas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 98932951.1 | 30.06.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998US13502 | Priority number, date | US19970051905P | 08.07.1997 Original published format: US 51905 P | US19970064493P | 05.11.1997 Original published format: US 64493 P | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902483 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994845 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/16 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
C07C209/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/16, C07C211/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [2000/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHYLAMINEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON CHABAZITKATALYSATOREN | [2000/17] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING METHYLAMINES USING CHABAZITE CATALYSTS | [2000/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE METHYLAMINES AU MOYEN DE CATALYSEURS A BASE DE CHABASITE | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/16] | 17.11.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4544538 (ZONES STACEY I [US]) [AD] 1,8* column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 11 *; | [A]EP0183423 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-7,9 * examples 42-45; claims 1,10 *; | [A]EP0210718 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-7,9 * example 1; claims 1,8; table III *; | [D]US4752596 (BERGNA HORACIO E [US], et al); | [A]EP0632012 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-7,9 * claim 1; tables 1-6 *; | [A]WO9518675 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-7,9 * page 25; example 3; claim 1 *; | [D]US5569785 (KOURTAKIS KONSTANTINOS [US], et al); | [X]EP0744395 (NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 3, line 40 - line 54; claims 1,6,8 * |