blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0977510

EP0977510 - IMAGE-GUIDED THORACIC THERAPY AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.01.2003  [2003/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOSENSE, INC.
220 Belle Meade Road
Setauket, NY 11733 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / ACKER, David, E.
27 Tavern Way
Setauket, NY 11733 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date98933067.502.07.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998US13736
Priority number, dateUS1998003024125.02.1998         Original published format: US 30241
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9943253
Date:02.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977510
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.09.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/00, A61B6/00, A61B5/06
[2001/18]
CPC:
A61B6/541 (EP,US); A61B5/062 (EP,US); A61B5/415 (EP,US);
A61B5/418 (EP,US); A61B1/2676 (EP,US); A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61B6/508 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/06]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDGEFÜHRTEN THORAX-THERAPIE[2000/06]
English:IMAGE-GUIDED THORACIC THERAPY AND APPARATUS THEREFOR[2000/06]
French:THERAPIE THORACIQUE GUIDEE PAR IMAGE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999National basic fee paid 
22.11.1999Search fee paid 
22.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
11.11.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5271055  (HSIEH JIANG [US], et al) [Y] 1,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 26 - column 8, line 68; tables 1-4 * [A] 5-10,17;
 [A]US5482042  (FUJITA HIDEHIRO [JP]) [A] 5-10* abstract *;
 [DYA]WO9729709  (BIOSENSE INC [US], et al) [DY] 1,16 * page 16, line 20 - page 22, line 12; tables 4,5 * [A] 3,11-15,18,19
International search[A]US5316024  (HIRSCHI RICHARD E [US], et al);
 [X]US5577502  (DARROW ROBERT D [US], et al);
 [X]US5671739  (DARROW ROBERT DAVID [US], et al);
 [XP]US5730129  (DARROW ROBERT DAVID [US], et al);
 [AE]US5775322  (SILVERSTEIN FRED E [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.