EP1004128 - UNIVERSAL SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lear Automotive Dearborn, Inc. 5200 Auto Club Drive Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | [2000/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARASIK, Boris 450 Woodland Hills Drive Walled Lake, MI 48390 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98933244.0 | 08.07.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998US14094 | Priority number, date | US19970898137 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: US 898137 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905691 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004128 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01H23/00 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
H01H11/0006 (EP,US);
H01H2011/0043 (EP,US);
H01H23/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | UNIVERSALSCHALTER | [2000/22] | English: | UNIVERSAL SWITCH | [2000/22] | French: | INTERRUPTEUR UNIVERSEL | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 12.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/13] | 28.10.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3118031 (DUNCAN EUGENE F) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US3571545 (HADERER EDWARD G) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US3684850 (KADERBEK CHARLES J, et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US3852552 (KIMIJIMA H, et al) [A] 1-21* abstract *; | [A]US3944768 (ARYAMANE AVINASH, et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]DE2636632 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |