EP0980577 - SWITCHING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marquardt GmbH Schlossstrasse 16 D-78604 Rietheim-Weilheim / DE | [2000/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIZELE, Rainer Kolpingweg 39 D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Heinrich Fürstensteinweg D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 03 /
RAPP, Klaus Haugenrainstrasse 9 D-78073 Öfingen / DE | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Otten, Herbert Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Otten, Herbert Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98933440.4 | 05.05.1998 | [2000/08] | WO1998DE01235 | Priority number, date | DE1997119245 | 07.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19719245 | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850930 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980577 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980577 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/06 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
A47L15/4293 (EP,US);
D06F39/12 (EP,US);
H01H13/70 (EP,US);
H01H2011/065 (EP,US);
H01H2215/004 (EP,US);
H01H2217/022 (EP,US);
H01H2219/062 (EP,US);
H01H2219/064 (EP,US);
H01H2221/044 (EP,US);
H01H2223/002 (EP,US);
H01H2229/022 (EP,US);
H01H2229/042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [2000/08] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON SCHALTERN | [2000/08] | English: | SWITCHING ARRANGEMENT | [2000/08] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE COMMUTATEURS | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.03.2002 | [2003/09] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0158795 (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE9011110U (DR.EUGEN SASSE) [A] 1-6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5453586 (STOTTMANN RICHARD L [US]) [A] 1-7,9-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0074315 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-4,9-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5464955 (COLE RONALD E [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]DE3111409 (KAISER FOTOTECHNIK GMBH & CO K [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2208039 (HARBORO RUBBER COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 2-6 * abstract * |