EP0991567 - STABILISING DEVICE FOR SAILING BOAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiocca, Jacques Route des Marterays 74410 Saint Jorioz / FR | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Poncet, Jean-François Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Poncet, Jean-François Cabinet Poncet, 7, chemin de Tillier, B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2002/05] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/15] | Gasquet, Denis CABINET GASQUET, Les Pléiades, Park-Nord Annecy 74370 Metz Tessy / FR | Application number, filing date | 98933755.5 | 30.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998FR01388 | Priority number, date | FR19970008557 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9708557 | [2000/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901340 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991567 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B63B39/06, B63B3/38, // B63B41:00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B63B41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [2000/15] | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN SEGELBOOT | [2000/15] | English: | STABILISING DEVICE FOR SAILING BOAT | [2000/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STABILISATION POUR BATEAU A VOILE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 02.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/31] | 07.03.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/31] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3939437 (LOIDL WALTER [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,9 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7; | [YA]DE607506 (WILKE BUENING) [Y] 5,7 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * page 2, line 1 - line 16 * * page 2, line 47 - line 63 * [A] 1-4,6,9; | [X]FR2198451 (CHAUVIN GILBERT [FR]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE3713176 (VICTORA ERICH [DE]) [X] 1,8-10 * figures 1-3,8-13 * * column 8, line 18 - line 27 *; | [X]WO8700814 (COHEN DANIEL L) [X] 1,2,9 * figures 13,17 * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 28 *; | [X]FR2552730 (MAILLARD JACK [FR]) [X] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4119430 (KUNSTSTOFFSPEZIALTEILE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * figures 2,2A; claim 1 *; | [X]US3990384 (REYNOLDS III COLLINS J) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract *; | [X]GB2270040 (ADAMS ROBIN HENRY DOUGLAS [GB]) [X] 1,9 * figures 2,3 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 23 *; | [X]US3690284 (STADT ERICUS GERHARDUS VAN DE) [X] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0280456 (STANFORD ULF HARRY [US], et al) | by applicant | FR2727668 |