EP0994612 - Circuit for detecting the pase of received signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/16] | CIRCUIT FOR DETECTING THE PHASE OF RECEIVED SIGNAL | ||
[2007/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8501 / JP | [2007/26] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORII, Akihiro Room 108, 3-4719-5, Soubudai Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0011 / JP | 02 /
SHIRAISHI, Kenichi Room 407, 475-3, Kariba-cyo, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0025 / JP | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/16] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98933879.3 | 22.07.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998JP03262 | Priority number, date | JP19970212746 | 24.07.1997 Original published format: JP 21274697 | JP19970212747 | 24.07.1997 Original published format: JP 21274797 | [2000/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905835 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994612 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994612 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/22 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
H04L27/2332 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/16] | Title | German: | Schaltung zur Erfassung der Phase eines empfangenen Signals | [2007/07] | English: | Circuit for detecting the pase of received signal | [2007/07] | French: | Circuit de détéction de phase d'un signal récu | [2007/07] |
Former [2000/16] | SCHALTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG DER PHASE EINES EMPFANGENEN SIGNALS | ||
Former [2000/16] | CIRCUIT FOR DETECTING THE PHASE OF RECEIVED SIGNAL | ||
Former [2000/16] | CIRCUIT DE DETECTION DE PHASE D'UN SIGNAL RECU | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2000 | Translation filed | 24.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0994611 (KENWOOD CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3421084 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 2-5 * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 32 * * figures 11,13 * | International search | [A]JPS6010855 (RICOH KK); | [A]JPS53137657 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH0983598 (TOKIMEC INC); | [A]JPS62216557 (NEC CORP) |