blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0930328

EP0930328 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GRANULATED POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
Asahi Glass Company Ltd.
1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUNAKI, Atsushi, Asahi Glass Co. Ltd.
Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0863 / JP
02 / TAKAKURA, Teruo, Asahi Glass Co.Ltd.
Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0863 / JP
[1999/29]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/29]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date98933909.823.07.1998
[1999/29]
WO1998JP03295
Priority number, dateJP1997019891024.07.1997         Original published format: JP 19891097
JP1997029010822.10.1997         Original published format: JP 29010897
[1999/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9905203
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0930328
Date:21.07.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0930328
Date:20.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.02.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C08J3/16, C08L27/18
[1999/29]
CPC:
C08J3/12 (EP,US); C08J2327/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GRANULIERTEN POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENPULVERS[1999/29]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GRANULATED POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE POWDER[1999/29]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UNE POUDRE GRANULAIRE DE POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE[1999/29]
Entry into regional phase10.03.1999Translation filed 
11.03.1999National basic fee paid 
11.03.1999Search fee paid 
11.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/29]
07.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2001Fee for grant paid
06.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06306179  ;
 [AD]GB1137349  (HOECHST AG) [AD] 1 * page 3, lines 60,61 *;
 [AD]GB1100388  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [AD] 1 * table III *;
 [A]EP0455210  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0448995  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 26-35 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 03, Database accession no. 1995-019342, XP002123723 & JPH06306179 A 19941101 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH06306179  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD);
 [A]JPH04218534  (DAIKIN IND LTD);
 [A]JPH0413729  (DAIKIN IND LTD);
 [A]JPS5650947  (DU PONT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.