Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001509372 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US5218697 | 10.07.1997 | US9814371 | 10.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1003780 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5218697 | 10.07.1997 | US9814371 | 10.07.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6358707 | 19.03.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5218697 | 10.07.1997 | US9814371 | 10.07.1998 | US46227000 | 05.01.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9902561 | Global Dossier | 21.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5218697 | 10.07.1997 |